Teaney v. Coalview Recovery Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brittney Teaney
Defendant: Coalview Recovery Group LLC, Dredge Central LLC, Dredge Central of Tennessee LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2021cv05880
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Jeffrey Gordon Bradford for Defendant Dredge Central LLC. (Bradford, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC)
January 21, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William J Dow on behalf of Defendant Dredge Central LLC. (Dow, William)
January 21, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Francis S Floyd on behalf of Defendant Dredge Central LLC. (Floyd, Francis)
January 21, 2022 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Dredge Central of Tennessee LLC. Noting Date 1/21/2022, (West, David)
January 20, 2022 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Coalview Recovery Group LLC (Blackburn, Joanne)
January 20, 2022 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Coalview Recovery Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/20/2022, (Blackburn, Joanne)
January 19, 2022 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates James Morris. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dredge Central of Tennessee LLC (West, David) Modified on 1/21/2022 to identify Corporate Parent/Affiliate James Morris(SP).
January 19, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew N. Ackley on behalf of Plaintiff Brittney Teaney. (Ackley, Andrew)
January 18, 2022 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dredge Central LLC (Bradford, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David R West on behalf of Defendant Dredge Central of Tennessee LLC. (West, David)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 2/8/2022. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
January 18, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Dredge Central LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time) Noting Date 1/18/2022, (Bradford, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey Gordon Bradford on behalf of Defendant Dredge Central LLC. (Bradford, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ray W Kahler on behalf of Plaintiff Brittney Teaney. (Kahler, Ray)
December 30, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dredge Central of Tennessee LLC on 12/28/2021, filed by Plaintiff Brittney Teaney. (Kahler, Ray)
December 28, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dredge Central, LLC on 12/28/2021, filed by Plaintiff Brittney Teaney. (Kahler, Ray)
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joanne Thomas Blackburn on behalf of Defendant Coalview Recovery Group LLC. (Blackburn, Joanne)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Kerry Fuller of Mailing by Plaintiff Brittney Teaney (Kessler, Keith)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Coalview Recovery Group on 12/15/2021, filed by Plaintiff Brittney Teaney. (Kessler, Keith)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Keith L. Kessler on behalf of Plaintiff Brittney Teaney. (Kessler, Keith) (Main Document 6 replaced to flatten image on 12/10/2021) (ZMG).
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/22/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/28/2022, Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2022. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
December 6, 2021 JSR due 3/7/2022. (JL)
December 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Coalview Recovery Group LLC, Dredge Central LLC, Dredge Central of Tennessee LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Dredge Central, #2 Summons - Dredge Central of Tennessee)(AMD)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7356554), filed by Brittney Teaney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kahler, Ray)
December 3, 2021 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teaney v. Coalview Recovery Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Teaney
Represented By: Kamela James
Represented By: Ray W Kahler
Represented By: Keith L. Kessler
Represented By: Andrew N. Ackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coalview Recovery Group LLC
Represented By: Natalia Smirnova
Represented By: Joanne Thomas Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dredge Central LLC
Represented By: Francis S Floyd
Represented By: Jeffrey Gordon Bradford
Represented By: William J Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dredge Central of Tennessee LLC
Represented By: David R West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?