Ramos v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jason Micheal Ramos
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections, Stephen Sinclair, Stafford Creek Corrections Center, Howard Yardley, Ronald Haynes, Ryan Herrington, Bonnie Joy, Scott Light, Sasha Bangs and Eric Lystad
Case Number: 3:2021cv05902
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER, made at the direction of Hon. Michelle L Peterson. A review of the #9 Amended Complaint suggests there was a problem scanning the document at the Stafford Creek Corrections Center where the plaintiff is currently incarcerated, as only a small fraction of page six of the amended pleading is visible on the document emailed to the Court. In order to ensure the Court has a complete copy of the pleading, the plaintiff is directed to re-submit his amended complaint, in its entirety, not later than February 22, 2022. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
February 4, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Jason Micheal Ramos. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
February 4, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT,, filed by Jason Micheal Ramos against defendant(s) Sasha Bangs, Ronald Haynes, Ryan Herrington, Bonnie Joy with JURY DEMAND **20 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
February 4, 2022 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. **DO NOT PRINT**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE #5 COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND, by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date on which this Order is signed. The Clerk is directed to note this matter on the Court's calendar for February 22, 2022 for review of the Plaintiff's amended complaint. (Attachments: #1 Amended 1983 Complaint form)**17 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #6 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL, signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
January 21, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Jason Micheal Ramos. **DO NOT PRINT**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Jason Micheal Ramos against defendant(s) Sasha Bangs, Ronald Haynes, Ryan Herrington, Bonnie Joy, Scott Light, Eric Lystad, Stephen Sinclair, Stafford Creek Corrections Center, Washington State Department of Corrections, Howard Yardley with JURY DEMAND. **DO NOT PRINT**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
January 21, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2022. **DO NOT PRINT**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
January 21, 2022 Review Amended Complaint. NOTED on motion calendar 2/22/2022. **DO NOT PRINT**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Peterson, filed by Jason Micheal Ramos. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel, #4 Prison Trust Account Statement)**24 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
December 30, 2021 IFP deficiency corrected. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application. ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 1/13/2022 to correct IFP application. (Attachments: #1 IFP form) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
December 14, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Application. NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Stafford Creek Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Jason Micheal Ramos. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 List of Documents Submitted, #3 PROPOSED Motion for Counsel, #4 Prison Trust Account Statement)**23 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jason Ramos, Prisoner ID: 805141)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Micheal Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stafford Creek Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Yardley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasha Bangs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lystad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?