Delamarter et al v. Delamarter et al
Plaintiff: Brian Rick Delamarter and DEL-BLB LLC
Defendant: Harold G. Delamarter, Gregory J. Vislocky, Does 1-10, Harold G Delamarter and Gregory J Vislocky
Nominal Defendant: Prestige Care Inc and Prestige Senior Living LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv05939
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND by Harold G Delamarter.(Martirosian, Claire)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/18/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/4/2022, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
January 28, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB)
January 28, 2022 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 3/11/2022. (KEB)
January 27, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND by Gregory J Vislocky.(Martirosian, Claire)
January 25, 2022 Attorney Robert M Sulkin, Abigail B Johnston added for Harold G Delamarter and Gregory J Vislocky; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (AMD)
January 24, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Claire Martirosian on behalf of Defendants Harold G Delamarter, Gregory J Vislocky. (Martirosian, Claire)
January 21, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Gregory J. Vislocky on 1/5/2022 1/6/2022, filed by Plaintiffs DEL-BLB LLC, Brian Rick Delamarter. (Davison, Zachary) Modified on 1/21/2022 to update date of service (KB).
January 21, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Harold G. Delamarter on 1/5/2022 1/17/2022, filed by Plaintiffs DEL-BLB LLC, Brian Rick Delamarter. (Davison, Zachary) Modified on 1/21/2022 to update date of service (KB).
January 21, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Prestige Care, Inc. on 1/3/2022 1/4/2022, filed by Plaintiffs DEL-BLB LLC, Brian Rick Delamarter. (Davison, Zachary) Modified on 1/21/2022 to update date of service (KB).
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Prestige Senior Living, LLC on 1/3/2022 1/4/2022, filed by Plaintiffs DEL-BLB LLC, Brian Rick Delamarter. (Davison, Zachary) Modified on 1/21/2022 to update date of service (KB).
January 21, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #8 #9 #10 #11 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint: Modified on 1/21/2022 to update dates of services. Service on Prestige Senior Living, LLC and Prestige Care, Inc. was made 1/4/2022, service on Harold G. Delamarter was made 1/17/2022, and service on Gregory J. Vislocky was made 1/6/2022. (KB)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher Reeder for Plaintiffs DEL-BLB LLC and Brian Rick Delamarter by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin S. Tragish for Plaintiffs DEL-BLB LLC and Brian Rick Delamarter by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher S. Reeder FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs DEL-BLB LLC, Brian Rick Delamarter (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7404535 (Davison, Zachary)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin S. Tragish FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs DEL-BLB LLC, Brian Rick Delamarter (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7404520 (Davison, Zachary)
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendants Harold G Delamarter, Prestige Care Inc, Prestige Senior Living LLC, Gregory J Vislocky. (AMD)
January 3, 2022 Judge David W. Christel added. (AMD)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Robert Grieg as Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DEL-BLB LLC (Davison, Zachary) Modified on 1/3/2022 (AMD).
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Breach of Written Contract, Accounting, Declaratory Relief, Injunctive Relief, Appointment of Receiver, and Judicial Dissolution against defendant(s) Harold G. Delamarter, Does 1-10, Prestige Care Inc, Prestige Senior Living LLC, Gregory J. Vislocky with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7387649) Attorney Zachary E Davison added to party DEL-BLB LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Zachary E Davison added to party Brian Rick Delamarter(pty:pla), filed by Brian Rick Delamarter, DEL-BLB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Davison, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delamarter et al v. Delamarter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Rick Delamarter
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Benjamin S Tragish
Represented By: Christopher Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEL-BLB LLC
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Represented By: Benjamin S Tragish
Represented By: Christopher Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold G. Delamarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Vislocky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold G Delamarter
Represented By: Abigail B Johnston
Represented By: Claire Martirosian
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J Vislocky
Represented By: Abigail B Johnston
Represented By: Claire Martirosian
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Prestige Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Prestige Senior Living LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?