Huisingh et al v. Lawson et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Huisingh and Valerie Huisingh
Defendant: Leon Lawson doing business as Dogcon Auto LLC and Rikki L Lawson
Case Number: 3:2022cv05299
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING PLAINITFFS' #9 MOTION FOR REMAND. The matter is remanded to Mason County Superior Court. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 7/1/2022. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (AMD)
June 3, 2022 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #19 Response to Motion,, To Remand & Defendants Motion to Strike (Lawson, Rikki)
June 2, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendant Rikki L Lawson, to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 USC 1446. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplement ERRP mason co, #2 Exhibit Supplement Orm, #3 Exhibit Supplement cfpb, #4 Exhibit Supplement taxes, #5 Exhibit Supplement purchase opt 2017, #6 Exhibit Supplement interviews, #7 Exhibit Supplement purchase opt 2019, #8 Exhibit Supplement Navy and easement, #9 Exhibit Supplement OFAC directive 4, #10 Exhibit Supplement clerks, #11 Exhibit Supplement irs and drafts)(Lawson, Rikki) Modified attachment names on 6/2/2022 per defendant (AMD).
June 2, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #19 Response to Motion: Corrected attachment names at the request of defendant. (AMD)
May 26, 2022 Filing 18 DECLARATION Certification of State Records Verification by Defendant Rikki L Lawson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Lawson, Rikki)
May 26, 2022 Filing 17 PRAECIPE to attach document (Complete State Verified Records) Attachment to re #11 Verification of State Court Records by Defendant Rikki L Lawson (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amend Doc. 11-1 State Verified, #2 Supplement Attach Doc. 11-1 State Verified, #3 Supplement Attach Doc. 11-1 State Verified, #4 Supplement Attach Doc. 11-1 State Verified, #5 Supplement Attach Doc. 11-1 State Verified)(Lawson, Rikki)
May 26, 2022 Filing 16 PRAECIPE re #10 Praecipe to Attach Document, Amend Praecipe by Defendant Rikki L Lawson (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Amend Doc. 10 Complaint Praecipe, #2 Amended Complaint Amend Doc. 10-1 Cross Complaint, #3 Supplement Amend Doc. 10-2 State records Portrait)(Lawson, Rikki)
May 25, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 USC 1446, by Plaintiffs Raymond Huisingh, Valerie Huisingh. (Naud, Kevin)
May 25, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #14 Affidavit of Defendants Notice of Related Case: Updated document name and added link to doc. (AMD)
May 24, 2022 Filing 14 Affidavit of Defendants #13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:22-CV-05278-DGE, 22-573300,, by Defendant Rikki L Lawson. (Lawson, Rikki) Modified on 5/25/2022 to correct doc name & add link (AMD).
May 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:22-cv-05278-DGE, by Defendant Rikki L Lawson. (Lawson, Rikki)
May 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin J Naud on behalf of Plaintiffs Raymond Huisingh, Valerie Huisingh. (Naud, Kevin)
May 18, 2022 Filing 11 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Rikki L Lawson (Attachments: #1 Supplement partial records)(Lawson, Rikki)
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 PRAECIPE to attach document (initial complaint -00521) Complaint, Cross & Counter Complaints re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Rikki L Lawson (Attachments: #1 Complaint crossclaim complaint, #2 Supplement SJ order CR59 order supplement record)(Lawson, Rikki)
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 USC 1446, filed by Plaintiffs Raymond Huisingh, Valerie Huisingh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand) Noting Date 6/3/2022, (Nichols, Julie)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Rikki L Lawson, Other Affiliate Leon Aaron Lawson, Other Affiliate Dogcon Auto LLC for Rikki L Lawson. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rikki L Lawson (Attachments: #1 Supplement Secretary of State, #2 Supplement Business Information)(Lawson, Rikki)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE: Defendant Leon Lawson has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE: Defendant Rikki L Lawson has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc ad hoc attorney Naud(CDA)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re Rikki Lawson re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Notice of Pendency of Other Action, and Complaint Not Provided. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD - cc: defts)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Mason County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AMD - cc: defts)
May 4, 2022 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/11/2022. (AMD - cc: defts)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mason County Superior Court, case number 21-2-00521-23; (Receipt # TAC016993), filed by Rikki L Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Documents: Declaration and Notice of Appeal, #4 State Court Documents: OSC, Motion and Complaint (case# 22-2-00174-23), #5 Transmittal E-mail)(AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huisingh et al v. Lawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Huisingh
Represented By: Julie M. Nichols
Represented By: Tracy E DiGiovanni
Represented By: Kevin J Naud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Huisingh
Represented By: Julie M. Nichols
Represented By: Tracy E DiGiovanni
Represented By: Kevin J Naud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Lawson doing business as Dogcon Auto LLC
Represented By: Leon Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rikki L Lawson
Represented By: Rikki L Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?