Harrison v. Pedro
Petitioner: Timothy Harrison
Respondent: Jeri Boe and D Pedro
Case Number: 3:2022cv05757
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Petition signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Amended petition to be filed not later than December 30, 2022. (JWC)
December 2, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2022. (JWC)
December 1, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED 2254 PETITION, filed by Timothy Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (JWC)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Petitioner Timothy Harrison. (JWC)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DECLINING to Serve #5 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and GRANTING Leave to Amend by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (cc: Petitioner via USPS w/ 2254 forms) (JWC)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (cc: Petitioner via USPS) (JWC)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER from Timothy Harrison re Corrections Sent to Court (copy of docket sheet sent to Petitioner via USPS) (JWC)
October 20, 2022 REFERRING #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to: Judge Michelle L. Peterson (JWC)
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 CORRECTED 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # TAC 3-52), filed by Timothy Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 IFP (moot - filing fee paid), #3 Prison Trust Account Statement, #4 Cover Letter) (JWC)
October 20, 2022 Deficiency Corrected (JWC)
October 11, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ***Action Required***See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 11/10/2022 to re-submit first page of petition. (cc: petitioner w/first page of petition via USPS) (ST)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Timothy Harrison. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order)(ST)
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Timothy Harrison. (Receipt # TAC 3-52) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 IFP (moot - filing fee paid), #3 Prison Trust Account Statement, #4 Cover Letter)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Pedro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D Pedro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?