Nielsen v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Denise Nielsen
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv05846
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Swale, Sarah)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/30/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/6/2023, Joint Status Report due by 2/13/2023. (MET)
November 15, 2022 Attorney Gabriel Baker added for Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company; per #3 Notice of Appearance. (AMD)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company mailed on 11/9/2022 (Engle, Aaron)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company mailed on 11/9/2022 (Engle, Aaron)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company; Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Aetna, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Swale, Sarah)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah E Swale on behalf of Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Swale, Sarah)
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(AMD)
November 2, 2022 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (AMD)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR LONG TERM DISABILITY BENEFITS against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7761737), filed by Denise Nielsen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Hartford, #3 Summons Aetna)(Engle, Aaron) (Attachment 1 replaced due to malformed PDF on 11/2/2022) (AMD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nielsen v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Nielsen
Represented By: Aaron Isak Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Sarah E Swale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah E Swale
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?