McGillvary v. Dorsey
Plaintiff: Caleb L McGillvary
Defendant: Lamont Dorsey
Case Number: 3:2022cv05883
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Seal. The Clerk shall place McGillvary's in forma pauperis applications, Dkts. #1 and #6 , under seal. To the extent it is still pending, McGillvary's application to proceed in forma pauperis, Dkt. #6 , is DENIED as moot because he already paid the filing fee. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
January 9, 2023 Filing 9 Summons(es) Issued in Paper Form as to defendant(s) Lamont Dorsey. (original issued summons mailed to plaintiff in provided self-addressed, stamped envelope) (MW)
January 9, 2023 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Caleb L McGillvary (MW)
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal IFP Application, filed by Plaintiff Caleb L McGillvary. Noted by Clerk for 1/13/2023. (MW)
December 21, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Caleb L McGillvary. (MW)
December 21, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MW)
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Lamont Dorsey with JURY DEMAND, filed by Caleb L McGillvary. (Attachments: #1 Cover page)(ZMG)
December 8, 2022 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 402.00, receipt number T3-120 (ZMG)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application. ***Action Required*** Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (Attachments: #1 AO 120) (MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application. ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 12/15/2022 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Caleb L McGillvary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGillvary v. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb L McGillvary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamont Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?