Bianchi v. Boe
Petitioner: Ronald Jay Bianchi
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Case Number: 3:2022cv05957
Filed: December 11, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # S2-959), filed by Ronald Jay Bianchi.**348 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ronald Bianchi, Prisoner ID: 729044) (JWC) Modified on 12/22/2022 to add 2254 (JWC).
December 22, 2022 Deficiency Corrected **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ronald Bianchi, Prisoner ID: 729044) (JWC)
December 22, 2022 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $5, receipt number S2-959 **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ronald Bianchi, Prisoner ID: 729044) (JWC)
December 12, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ***Action Required*** 2241/2254 Filing Fee Not Paid, Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 1/11/2023 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ronald Bianchi, Prisoner ID: 729044) (JWC)
December 11, 2022 Filing 1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Ronald Jay Bianchi (No IFP Application Filed/No Filing Fee Paid) **348 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ronald Bianchi, Prisoner ID: 729044) (JWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bianchi v. Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Jay Bianchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?