Cabello Garcia v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Linda Cabello Garcia
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M Jaddou and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 3:2022cv05984
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney M Samer Budeir on behalf of Defendants Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Budeir, M)
February 10, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Hans H. Chen on behalf of Defendants Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Chen, Hans)
February 9, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #17 Declaration, #15 Declaration, #14 Declaration, #19 Declaration, #18 Declaration, #13 Declaration, #10 Declaration, #12 Declaration, #11 Declaration, #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #16 Declaration (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Sara Coppin filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Maria Urbina Morales filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Marcela Zarate Aguilar filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Clara Zamacona Tellez filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Teodoro Trujillo Estrada filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Julian Vazquez Arenas filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Adriana Gutierrez Acuna filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Linda Cabello Garcia filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Matt Adams filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #8 MOTION to Certify Class (Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Sydney Maltese filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia re #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Korthuis, Aaron)
February 9, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Korthuis, Aaron)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to USCIS; Ur Jaddou; Alejandro Mayorkas; Civil Process Clerk on 12/20/2022, filed by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Adams, Matt)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jason Lowell Baumetz for Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
December 28, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jason Lowell Baumetz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7827911 (Adams, Matt)
December 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ur M Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, US Citizenship and Immigration Services (MW)
December 19, 2022 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (MW)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:22-cv-00904-MJP, by Plaintiff Linda Cabello Garcia. (Adams, Matt)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7816957), filed by Linda Cabello Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons USCIS, #3 Summons Mayorkas, #4 Summons Jaddou, #5 Summons Civil Process Clerk)(Adams, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabello Garcia v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Cabello Garcia
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Aaron Korthuis
Represented By: Glenda M Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Jason Lowell Baumetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Hans H. Chen
Represented By: M Samer Budeir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M Jaddou
Represented By: M Samer Budeir
Represented By: Hans H. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Hans H. Chen
Represented By: M Samer Budeir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?