Yallup v. Olbers et al
Plaintiff: Richard Eugene Yallup, Jr
Defendant: Julie A Olbers and Christopher A Stone
Case Number: 3:2023cv05803
Filed: September 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE COMPLAINT. Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint on or before 11/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (Attachments: #1 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Form, #2 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)**14 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Yallup, Prisoner ID: 313822)(AMD)
October 4, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Julie A Olbers, Christopher A Stone with JURY DEMAND filed by Richard Eugene Yallup, Jr. (IFP Granted) (Attachments: #1 Complaint - Part 2)**1309 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Yallup, Prisoner ID: 313822)(AMD)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Judge David W. Christel. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Yallup, Prisoner ID: 313822)(AMD)
September 19, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER: re #4 Prison Trust Account Statement. RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Coyote Ridge Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Yallup, Prisoner ID: 313822)(AMD)
September 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing CD's in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiff Richard Eugene Yallup, Jr. (CD's received and placed in Tacoma clerk's office filing cabinet)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Yallup, Prisoner ID: 313822)(AMD)
September 14, 2023 Filing 4 Prison Trust Account Statement. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Yallup, Prisoner ID: 313822)(AMD)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Yallup, Prisoner ID: 313822)(AMD)
September 7, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge David W. Christel, filed by Richard Eugene Yallup, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint - Part 1, #2 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint - Part 2, #3 Cover Letter)**1330 PAGE(S) filed and 84 blank pages removed, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Richard Yallup, Prisoner ID: 313822)(AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yallup v. Olbers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Eugene Yallup, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A Olbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?