PSM Holdings LLC et al v. Tiny Town LLC et al
Plaintiff: PSM Worldwide LLC and PSM Holdings LLC
Defendant: Tiny Town LLC, Surapha Nelson and Lucas Nelson
Case Number: 3:2024cv05579
Filed: July 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tiffany M Cartwright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Tiny Town LLC mailed on 8/5/2024 (Oates, Daniel)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Surapha Nelson mailed on 8/5/2024 (Oates, Daniel)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Lucas Nelson mailed on 8/5/2024 (Oates, Daniel)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (CJS)
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT re #4 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter by Plaintiffs PSM Holdings LLC, PSM Worldwide LLC (Oates, Daniel)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/7/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/15/2024, Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2024. (MET)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CJS)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright added. (CJS)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lane Conrad on behalf of Plaintiffs PSM Holdings, LLC, PSM Worldwide, LLC. (Conrad, Lane)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by PSM Holdings, LLC, PSM Worldwide, LLC. (Oates, Daniel)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Lucas Nelson, Surapha Nelson, Tiny Town LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8550721) filed by PSM Holdings, LLC, PSM Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oates, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PSM Holdings LLC et al v. Tiny Town LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiny Town LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surapha Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSM Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Lane Conrad
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSM Holdings LLC
Represented By: Lane Conrad
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?