Baker v. State of Washington Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jamall S Baker
Defendant: Renee Ryburn, Calvin Cogburn, State of Washington Department of Corrections and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2024cv05893
Filed: October 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE COMPLAINT. The Court finds Plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, but provides Plaintiff leave to file an amended pleading by January 6, 2025, to cure the deficiencies identified herein. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (Attachments: #1 1983 Form)**16 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jamall Baker, Prisoner ID: 338926)(MW)
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance, Monroe Correctional Complex). Signed by Judge David W. Christel. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jamall Baker, Prisoner ID: 338926)(MW)
November 8, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge David W. Christel filed by Jamall S Baker. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Exhibits)**44 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jamall Baker, Prisoner ID: 338926)(MW)
October 22, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application. ***Action Required*** 1983 Filing Fee Not Paid, Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 11/21/2024 to correct IFP application **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jamall Baker, Prisoner ID: 338926)(MW)
October 18, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Jamall S Baker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)**13 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jamall Baker, Prisoner ID: 338926)(MW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. State of Washington Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Ryburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Cogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamall S Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?