Gossett v. Speer
Petitioner: Mark J Gossett
Respondent: Scott Speer
Case Number: 3:2024cv06039
Filed: December 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2025 Filing 10 PROPOSED Motion Requesting Judicial Notice filed by Petitioner Mark J Gossett **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mark Gossett, Prisoner ID: 317246) (CR)
January 22, 2025 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re #6 OBJECTIONS by Petitioner Mark J Gossett. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mark Gossett, Prisoner ID: 317246) (CR)
January 16, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER: re #7 Request. Docket Sheet dated 1/16/2025, attached for Petitioner. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Mark Gossett, Prisoner ID: 317246)(CJS)
January 14, 2025 Filing 7 REQUEST by Petitioner Mark J Gossett for Docket. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mark Gossett, Prisoner ID: 317246)(CJS)
January 9, 2025 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS by Petitioner Mark J Gossett to #4 Report and Recommendations. Noted by Clerk for 1/24/2025. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mark Gossett, Prisoner ID: 317246)(MW)
January 6, 2025 Filing 5 PROPOSED MOTION TO Order Show Cause filed by Petitioner Mark J Gossett. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mark Gossett, Prisoner ID: 317246)(MIH) Modified on 1/10/2025 to add text, NEF re-generated (MIH).
January 2, 2025 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson re #1 2241 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 1/16/2025, Noting Date 1/23/2025. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order of Dismissal, #2 PROPOSED Judgment)**7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Mark Gossett, Prisoner ID: 317246)(MIH)
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Mark Gossett, Prisoner ID: 317246)(CJS)
December 18, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson filed by Mark J Gossett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Request for Certification, #3 Prayer for Relief, #4 Memorandum in Support, #5 Affidavit in Support of Memorandum in Support, #6 Motion Requesting Brady Order, #7 Motion to Produce the Record, #8 Motion to Appoint Stand-By Counsel, #9 Motion to Take Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit - State Court Case Summary, #11 Certificate of Service)**58 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mark Gossett, Prisoner ID: 317246)(CJS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gossett v. Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark J Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?