Mountaineer Minerals, LLC v. Antero Resources Corporation
Plaintiff: Mountaineer Minerals, LLC
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Case Number: 1:2016cv00028
Filed: February 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Ritchie
Presiding Judge: Frederick P. Stamp
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOUNTAINEER MINERALS, LLC'S MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL [DKT. NO. 101 .] Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/4/2020. (wrr)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ANTERO RESOURCES' SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINEER MINERALSSUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant Antero ResourcesCorporation's supplemen tal motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 90 (titled Supplemental Brief in Support of Antero Resources Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment) is GRANTED. Accordingly, plaintiff Mountaineer Minerals, LLC's supplemental motion for summar y judgment (ECF No. 91 - titled Supplemental Memorandum on Remand from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that this civil action be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/5/2019. (wrr)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING AS FRAMED PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: The plaintiffs motion for summary judgment 52 is GRANTED AS FRAMED and the defendants motion for summary jud gment 54 is DENIED. The plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Defendants 23 and the defendants Motion to CompelJoinder of Perkins 24 are DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED that this civil action be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment on this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 8/10/17. (jss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountaineer Minerals, LLC v. Antero Resources Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountaineer Minerals, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Alex Miller, II
Represented By: Kenneth R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Represented By: W. Henry Lawrence
Represented By: Justin A. Rubenstein
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?