Clovis v. J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sheila A. Clovis
Defendant: J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. and Theodore Timothy Hill, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00147
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Clarksburg Office
County: Monongalia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (DeMasters, Peter)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc..(DeMasters, Peter)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Monongalia County (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Service thru SOS, #4 Notice of Filing Joint Notice of Removal, #5 Cover Letter) (jss)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/14/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/28/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 10/12/2018 at 02:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 10/19/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/31/18. (jss)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County filed by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Theodore Timothy Hill, Jr. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2636583 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Civil Case Information, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Joint Notice of Removal of Defendants J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. and Theodore Timothy Hill, Jr., #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss) Modified on 7/31/2018 to correct filing fee (jss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clovis v. J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Peter T DeMasters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Timothy Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Peter T DeMasters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila A. Clovis
Represented By: Raymond H. Yackel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?