AstraZeneca AB et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and AstraZeneca AB
Defendant: Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Laboratories Limited and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00193
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher N. Sipes. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (Copy counsel of record)(jmm)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Rubman. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Kudzin. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm) Modified on 10/24/2018 corrected signature date in docket text. (jmm).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna Q. Han Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2018. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee: $ 800.00, receipt number WVNC002386. For Attorneys A. Han, M. Kedzin, G. Rubman and C. Sipes. (jmm)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Christopher N. Sipes by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Gary M. Rubman by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Matthew Kudzin by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Anna Q. Han by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Han, Sipes, Rubman and Kudzin. (mh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002000. (mh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB. (mh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (mh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint,. (mh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Supplemental Information for Patent Cases Involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) re #1 Complaint, filed by AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Modified on 10/12/2018 to correct filer. NEF regen (mh).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and AstraZeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent Information, #2 Exhibit B - Patent Information, #3 Exhibit C - Patent Information, #4 Exhibit D - Patent Information, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AstraZeneca AB et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Gary M. Rubman
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Anna Q. Han
Represented By: Christopher N. Sipes
Represented By: Matthew Kudzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca AB
Represented By: Gary M. Rubman
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Anna Q. Han
Represented By: Christopher N. Sipes
Represented By: Matthew Kudzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?