United States of America et al v. Exxon Mobil Corporation
Plaintiff: State of West Virginia and United States of America
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00195
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM In Support by United States of America re #11 MOTION Unopposed to Enter The Consent Decree re #2 Notice (Other) . (Altmeyer, Helen)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION Unopposed to Enter The Consent Decree re #2 Notice (Other) by United States of America. (Altmeyer, Helen)
December 1, 2018 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh per Order entered 11/30/2018 in case 3:18mc128. Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to the case. There are no hearings scheduled before the District Judge to be reset at this time. (cmd)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Dkt. No. #7 . Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/30/2018. (jmm)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Attorney Laura A. Thoms. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/30/2018. (jmm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Notice of Appearance by United States of America. (Altmeyer, Helen)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura A. Thoms by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Altmeyer, Helen)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorney Joshua Van Eaton. (jmm)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission. ERROR: Attorney Nathianiel Douglas added by mistake. CORRECTION: Removed Attorney Douglas and Amended Attorney Verification. (jmm)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorneys Nathaniel Douglas and Joshua Van Eaton. (via email) (jmm)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Notice Of Lodging Of Proposed Consent Decree by State of West Virginia, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree)(jmm)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exxon Mobil Corporation, filed by United States of America, State of West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Exxon Mobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Charles Scott Driver, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nathaniel Douglas
Represented By: Helen Campbell Altmeyer
Represented By: Joshua Van Eaton
Represented By: Laura A. Thoms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?