Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mylan Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00202
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Inc., Mylan Inc... (O'Brien, William)
December 14, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Inc..(O'Brien, William)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 1/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/31/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2019 01:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 2/22/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/4/18. (mh)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 11/20/2018. (mh)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mylan Inc. served on 11/20/2018. (mh)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Anthony Sheh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/9/18. (mh)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Aaron P. Maurer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/9/18. (mh)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for David I. Berl to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/9/18. (mh)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for David M. Horniak to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/9/18. (mh)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 PHV Filing fee: $ 800.00, receipt number WVNC002403 re: Attorneys Sheh, Maurer, Berl and Horniak. (mh)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Anthony Sheh by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Aaron P. Maurer by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of David I. Berl by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of David M. Horniak by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Maurer, Sheh, Horniak and Berl. (mh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (mh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002018 (mh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint.(mh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Supplemental Information for Patent Cases Involving An Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (mh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Inc. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent Information, #2 Exhibit B - Patent Information, #3 Exhibit C - Patent Information, #4 Exhibit D - Patent Information, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Horniak
Represented By: Anthony Sheh
Represented By: David I. Berl
Represented By: Aaron P. Maurer
Represented By: James F. Companion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?