Wolfe et al v. Horace Mann Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Justin Wolfe and Sara Wolfe
Defendant: Teachers Insurance Company, Maple Leaf Industries, Inc. and Horace Mann Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00208
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Benjamin Salango on behalf of Justin Wolfe, Sara Wolfe (Salango, C.)
December 1, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2019 01:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. (cmd)
December 1, 2018 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh per Order entered 11/30/2018 in case 3:18mc128. Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to the case. (cmd)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SEAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL [DKT. NO. #2 ]: The Court DENIES as MOOT the defendants' motion to seal (Dkt. No. #2 ). Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/9/2018. (wrr)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 1/7/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/22/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2019 01:30 PM in Clarksburg Magistrate Judge Courtroom, 3rd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 2/11/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/9/2018. (wrr)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 REDACTION to #1 Notice of Removal by Horace Mann Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Company. (Durst, Tiffany)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Notice of Removal by Horace Mann Insurance Company, Teachers Insurance Company. (Durst, Tiffany)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Harrison County, WV, (case number 18-C-44-1), filed by Teachers Insurance Company, Horace Mann Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Cpmplaint, #2 Exhibit B-SOS Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C-Summons, #4 Exhibit D-Circuit Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit E-Circuit Court Dismissal Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claims Against Maple Leaf Industries, Inc., #6 Exhibit F-Circuit Court Dismissal Order Dismissing Minor Plaintiffs' Claims Against Maple Leaf Industries, Inc., #7 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Filing Fee: $400.00; Receipt No. 0424-2701323. (wrr) Modified on 11/8/2018 Document sealed by directive of Chief Judge Groh as document violates E-Govt. Act. (cmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe et al v. Horace Mann Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teachers Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany R. Durst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maple Leaf Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Mann Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany R. Durst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Wolfe
Represented By: Heather M. Noel
Represented By: Steven L Shaffer
Represented By: C. Benjamin Salango
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Wolfe
Represented By: Heather M. Noel
Represented By: Steven L Shaffer
Represented By: C. Benjamin Salango
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?