Bartley v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner: John Glenn Bartley
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00005
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re ERROR: Magistrate Judge Aloi and PSLC added to case. CORRECTION: Per Judge Keeley's instructions Magistrate Judge Aloi and PSLC removed. (jmm)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT, #2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/16/2019 per USPS website. (jmm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 2255 Packet)(mh) (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by John Glenn Bartley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartley v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Glenn Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael D. Stein
Represented By: Sarah E Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?