United States of America et al v. Antero Resources Corp.,
Plaintiff: The State Of West Virginia, West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection and United States of America
Defendant: Antero Resources Corp.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv00020
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION; Antero Resources Corporation to serve its answer or otherwise respond to the complaint filed on February 11, 2019, is extended to May 1, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/11/2019. (jmm)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION by Antero Resources Corp.,. (Lawrence, W.)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley for all further proceedings. District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/8/2019. (copy Counsel of record)(jmm)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Antero Resources Corp.,. (Lawrence, W.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Henry Lawrence on behalf of Antero Resources Corp., (Lawrence, W.)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chole H. Kolman. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/14/2019. (jmm)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick R. Jacobi. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/14/2019. (jmm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Chloe H. Kolman by West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Altmeyer, Helen)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick R. Jacobi by West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Altmeyer, Helen)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet - Counsel for Plaintiffs Other Document re #1 Complaint, filed by West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. (Altmeyer, Helen)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antero Resources Corp.,, filed by United States of America, The State Of West Virginia, West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection. (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree, #2 Plainitts' Notice Of Lodging Of Consent Decree, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Antero Resources Corp.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State Of West Virginia
Represented By: Patrick R. Jacobi
Represented By: Helen Campbell Altmeyer
Represented By: Charles Scott Driver, III
Represented By: Pamela J. Lazos
Represented By: William J. Powell
Represented By: Chloe H. Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection
Represented By: Patrick R. Jacobi
Represented By: Helen Campbell Altmeyer
Represented By: Charles Scott Driver, III
Represented By: Pamela J. Lazos
Represented By: William J. Powell
Represented By: Chloe H. Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patrick R. Jacobi
Represented By: Helen Campbell Altmeyer
Represented By: Charles Scott Driver, III
Represented By: Pamela J. Lazos
Represented By: William J. Powell
Represented By: Chloe H. Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antero Resources Corp.,
Represented By: W. Henry Lawrence
Represented By: Armando F. Benincasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?