Seggie v. National Health Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Cara Seggie
Defendant: National Health Insurance Company and Meritain Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00105
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cara Seggie Plaintiffs Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Karlin, Allan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Herrick, Jordan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meritain Health, Inc.. (Murphy, Glen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Meritain Health, Inc..(Murphy, Glen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court Of Monongalia County. Case number 19-C-86. (jmm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Health Insurance Company. (Herrick, Jordan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by National Health Insurance Company.(Herrick, Jordan)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 7/8/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/22/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 01:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 5/9/2019. (wrr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court Of Monongalia County, (case number 19-C-86), filed by National Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Service National health Insurance Co., #2 Exhibit B Service Meritain Health, Inc, #3 Exhibit C Complaint, #4 Exhibit D Service, #5 Exhibit E Service, #6 Exhibit F Consent to Removal, #7 Exhibit G Notice Of filing, #8 Exhibit H Docket sheet)Filing Fee Paid $400 - Receipt #0424-2816885. (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seggie v. National Health Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles R. Bailey
Represented By: Jordan K. Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritain Health, Inc.
Represented By: James E. Simon
Represented By: Glen A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Seggie
Represented By: Allan N. Karlin
Represented By: Jane E. Peak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?