Minix v. Central Source, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joshua J. Minix
Defendant: Capitol One, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Central Source, LLC, Child Support Collection Unit, Equifax Information Services, LLC., U.S. Department of Education, Experian Information Solutions, Incorporated, Biltmore Asset Management and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00108
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Capitol One. (Cooper, Massie)
June 26, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Central Source, LLC. (Butler, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 42 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joshua J. Minix. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(wrr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Remand filed by Capitol One, Central Source, LLC, Child Support Collection Unit, Equifax Information Services, LLC., Experian Information Solutions, Incorporated, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ryan, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by TransUnion, LLC of Amended Joinder and Consent to Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ryan, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The plaintiff's claims against defendant Biltmore Asset Management, LLC are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/19/2019. (Copy to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
June 19, 2019 Filing 38 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal by Biltmore Asset Management. (Schwendeman, Adam)
June 12, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Child Support Collection Unit re #36 Notice (Other) Amended COS for Notice of Amended Joinder and Consent to Removal. (Shuler, Tonya)
June 11, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Child Support Collection Unit of Amended Joinder and Consent to Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yianne, Ftemkos)
June 11, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Child Support Collection Unit Notice of Change of Attorney Information for Tonya Shuler (Shuler, Tonya)
June 10, 2019 Filing 34 RETURN RECEIPT as to #16 ORDER OF REFERRAL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/3/2019. (wrr) Modified on 6/11/2019 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated.
June 7, 2019 Filing 33 RETURN RECEIPT as to #31 ROSEBORO NOTICE: re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/4/2019. (wrr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Remand by Joshua J. Minix. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(wrr)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ROSEBORO NOTICE: re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Central Source, LLC, #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Capitol One. Within 21 days from the date of this Order, the pro se party shall file any opposition to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 5/31/2019. (Copy mailed to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
May 31, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Address by Adam J. Schwendeman. (cmd)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Corey A. Ruggiero. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 5/30/2019. (wrr) Modified on 6/5/2019 to correct docket text (wrr). Copy mailed to PS Plaintiff via USPS.
May 29, 2019 Filing 28 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to Corey Ruggiero: PAID $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002189. (wrr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Corey Ruggiero by Child Support Collection Unit. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yianne, Ftemkos)
May 29, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Biltmore Asset Management. (Corcoran, Daniel)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Zachary B. McConnell for Experian Information Solutions, Incorporated. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 5/28/2019. (Copy mailed via USPS to PS Plaintiff.)(wrr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Incorporated.. (Odell, Ashley)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/23/2019. (wrr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 Pro Hac Hice Filing fee as to Zachary B. McConell: PAID $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002611. (wrr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary B. McConnell by Experian Information Solutions, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Odell, Ashley)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorney's G. Johnson and C. Ruggiero. (via email) (jmm)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kari A. Morrigan. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 5/23/2019. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002609 for Attorney Kari A. Morrigan. (jmm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kari A. Morrigan by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Court REFERS this action to the Honorable Michael J. Aloi, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 5/23/2019 (copy counsel of record, via CM/ECF, copy pro se plaintiff via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Child Support Collection Unit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yianne, Ftemkos)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC.. (Ryan, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capitol One identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capitol One.. (Cooper, Massie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Capitol One. (Cooper, Massie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Capitol One. (Cooper, Massie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC.(Ryan, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Incorporated.(Odell, Ashley)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court Of Preston County. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment) (jmm) Modified on 6/11/2019 main document sealed per MJA violate the e-government act (jmm).
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central Source, LLC. (Butler, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Central Source, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum In Support of Defendant Central Source LLC's Motion to Dismiss)(Butler, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant Progressive Casualty Insuance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company.(Stryker, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Casualty Insurance Company.. (Stryker, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC... (Roskovensky, Vincent)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court as to Joshua J. Minix. (Mailed to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.) (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Exhibit A and State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Preston County, West Virginia, (case number 19-C-36), filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. Filing Fee $400 PAID- Receipt #0424-2821184. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Proof of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minix v. Central Source, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol One
Represented By: Massie P. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Stryker
Represented By: Monte L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Source, LLC
Represented By: David L. T. Butler
Represented By: Brian J. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Support Collection Unit
Represented By: Gregg T. Johnson
Represented By: Ftemkos J. Yianne
Represented By: Tonya P. Shuler
Represented By: Corey A. Ruggiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Represented By: Vincent M. Roskovensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Represented By: Zachary B. McConnell
Represented By: Ashley Hardesty Odell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biltmore Asset Management
Represented By: Daniel P. Corcoran
Represented By: Adam J. Schwendeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Kari A. Morrigan
Represented By: Robert Edward Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua J. Minix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?