Barton v. Entzel

Petitioner: Cherri N. Barton
Respondent: Warden Entzel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00111
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/20/2019. (wrr)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. Petitioner has refiled her petition on the court-approved form and it has been assigned Civil Action No 3:19cv103. Pursuant to the terms of the #2 Notice of Intent to Dismiss, this action is hereby DISMISSED and all matter relating to Petitioner's 2241 petition shall proceed in 3:19cv103. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/17/2019. (Copy to Petitioner via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice of Deficient Pleading and Intent to Dismiss. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/23/2019. (wrr)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001497 (mh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Deficient Pleading and Intent to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 2241 Packet)(mh) (To PS Petitioner via cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241 against Warden Entzel, filed by Cherri N. Barton. (Attachments: #1 Discussion, #2 Exhibit 1 - Center Discipline Committee Report, #3 Exhibit 2 - Admin. Remedy Appeal Form, #4 Exhibit 3 - Rejection Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Admin. Remedy Appeal, #6 Exhibit 5 - Rejection Notice, #7 Envelope)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cherri N. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?