Preston v. Gomez
Petitioner: James M. Preston
Respondent: Warden Christopher C. Gomez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00114
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 Filing fee received from James Preston: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002636. (dk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/14/2019 (per USPS website). (dk)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 6/11/2019. (Copy to Pro Se Petitioner by cert. mail). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BUT DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. Filing Fee to be paid within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 6/11/2019. (Copy to Pro Se Petitioner by cert. mail). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James M. Preston. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Deficiency Notice, #2 Envelope)(mh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James M. Preston. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheet, #2 Envelope)(mh)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other), and #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/28/2019. (dk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING (Copy with attachments to Pro Se Petitioner via certified mail). (Attachments: #1 IFP Form, #2 Attachment PTR Form) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (Copy to Pro Se Petitioner via certified mail). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT OF HABEAS APPLICATION PURSUANT TO 28 USC SECTION 2241 TO INCLUDE MEMORANDUM OF LAW by James M. Preston. (dk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Christopher C. Gomez, filed by James M. Preston. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition, #2 Attachment 1 - Sentencing Transcripts, #3 Attachment 2 - Copy of Prior State Charges, #4 Exhibit B - Sentencing Order, #5 Envelope) (dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preston v. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James M. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Christopher C. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?