Stout v. Preston County Sherriff (sic) Department et al
Plaintiff: Donald Carl Stout
Defendant: Officer Okin, Deputy Randy Stocket, Sherriff Daniel Loughrie and Preston County Sherriff (sic) Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00123
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN RECEIPT as to #18 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/5/2019. (jmm)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REDOCKET PLAINTIFFS LATER-FILED PAGE AS ATTACHMENT TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 7/1/2019 (copy pro se Plaintiff via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN RECEIPT as to #14 Order on Public Motion, #13 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/27/19. (njz)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 Response to #10 Order, titled "Motion to Correct Deficiencies" to #1 Complaint, filed by Donald Carl Stout. (Attachments: #1 Page 13 of #1 Complaint, #2 Envelope)(wrr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 ORDER DENYING 5 MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL, #10 ORDER TO CORRECT DEFICIENCIES, #9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/21/2019. (wrr)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CONSTRUING #12 MOTION AS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT AND DENYING THE SAME AS MOOT. The #12 Motion to Present Medical Report and Memorandum of Law filed by Plaintiff is construed as a motion to supplement. Upon review, the filing is duplicative, because it is the same document already filed as thememorandum attached to Plaintiffs complaint, and, accordingly, Plaintiff's #12 motion to supplement is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 6/24/2019. (Copy to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #11 SECOND MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 6/24/2019. (Copy to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 Pro Se MOTION to present Medical Report and Memorandum of Law in this case by Donald Carl Stout. (Attachments: #1 Progress Note ER Note, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Correspondence, #4 Envelope)(njz) attachment sealed per chambers
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Donald Carl Stout. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO CORRECT DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall have twenty-one days from entry of this Order to file a complete copy of his complaint, or, alternatively, only the missing page 13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 6/19/19. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. The Court will not require plaintiff to pay the initial partial filing fee but he shall be assessed the total $350.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 6/19/19. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail, copy mailed to Trustee with executed consent to collection of fees via regular mail, and emailed to fin admin Elkins with executed consent to collection of fees (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #5 MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 6/19/19. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/17/2019. (wrr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. ( copy pro se Plaintiff via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se Motion to Appoint Counsel by Donald Carl Stout. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Donald Carl Stout. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(jmm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Donald Carl Stout. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Carl Stout. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Loughrie, Okin, Preston County Sherriff (sic) Department, Randy Stocket, filed by Donald Carl Stout. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law, #2 cover letter, #3 Envelope)(jmm) Modified on 6/24/2019 to seal Memorandum of Law per MJA (wrr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #4 Page 13 of complaint per #18 Order to de #1 ) (jmm). Modified on 7/8/2019 added language to text (jmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stout v. Preston County Sherriff (sic) Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Okin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Randy Stocket
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherriff Daniel Loughrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston County Sherriff (sic) Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Carl Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?