Vifor (International) AG et al v. Mylan Laboratories Ltd.
Plaintiff: American Regent, Inc. and Vifor (International) AG
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00126
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY [DKT. NO. 26] AND STAYING THE CASE. The Court GRANTS the Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to stay the second-filed suit (Dkt. No. #26 ), STAYS the case, and CANCELS the schedulingconference, currently set for September 30, 2019 (Dkt. No. #25 ). Itfurther DIRECTS the parties to file a status report or to request a status conference with the Court by December 31, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/26/2019. (wrr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 28 Defendant's Non-Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay This Case Only Other Document re #26 MOTION to Stay The Second-Filed Suit in the Northern District of West Virginia filed by Mylan Laboratories Ltd.. (O'Brien, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support by American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG re #26 MOTION to Stay The Second-Filed Suit in the Northern District of West Virginia . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Companion, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay The Second-Filed Suit in the Northern District of West Virginia by American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG. (Companion, James)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/30/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/16/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 01:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/2/2019. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/1/2019. (wrr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William J O'Brien on behalf of Mylan Laboratories Ltd. (O'Brien, William)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Robert Shaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/27/2019. (dk)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Barbara R. Rudolph to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/27/2019. (dk)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for M. David Weingarten to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/27/19. (mh)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Constance P. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/27/2019. (dk)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Emily R. Gabranski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/27/19. (mh)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee - Constance P. Lee, Barbara R. Rudolph, M. David Weingarten, Emily R. Gabranski and Robert F. Shaffer: PAID $ 1,000.00, receipt number WVNC002638. (wrr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert F. Shaffer by American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily R. Gabranski by American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of M. David Weingarten by American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Barbara R. Rudolph by American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Constance P. Lee by American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Companion on behalf of American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Companion on behalf of American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Companion on behalf of American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Companion on behalf of American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Companion on behalf of American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Rudolph, Lee, Gabranski, Weingarten and Shaffer. (wrr) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/21/2019 with document with correct date) (wrr).
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee PAID: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002210. (wrr) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct filed date (wrr). NEF regenerated.
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG identifying Corporate Parent Vifor Pharma AG for Vifor (International) AG; Corporate Parents Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., Daiichi Sankyo U.S. Holdings, Inc., and Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited for American Regent, Inc. (wrr) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated.
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT TO USPTO ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK re #1 Complaint, filed by American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG. (wrr) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated.
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FOR PATENT CASES INVOLVING AN ABBREVIATED NEW DRUG APPLICATION (ANDA) re: #1 Complaint, filed by American Regent, Inc., Vifor (International) AG. (wrr) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated.
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Laboratories Ltd., filed by Vifor (International) AG, American Regent, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-'109 patent, #2 Exhibit B-'702 patent, #3 Exhibit C-'612 patent, #4 Exhibit D-'505 patent, #5 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #WVNW002210.(wrr) Modified on 6/21/2019 to correct filing date (wrr). Regenerated NEF.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vifor (International) AG et al v. Mylan Laboratories Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Regent, Inc.
Represented By: Emily R. Gabranski
Represented By: Robert F. Shaffer
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: M. David Weingarten
Represented By: Constance P. Lee
Represented By: Barbara R. Rudolph
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vifor (International) AG
Represented By: Emily R. Gabranski
Represented By: Robert F. Shaffer
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: M. David Weingarten
Represented By: Constance P. Lee
Represented By: Barbara R. Rudolph
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Ltd.
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?