Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00128
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court SCHEDULES a status conference by telephone for Friday, April 10, 2020, at 10:30 A.M. The plaintiff is DIRECTED to provide call-in information to all parties and the Court, by email to candace_levitsky@wvnd.uscourts.gov, no later than April 6, 2020. Also, the parties are DIRECTED to file a joint status report no later than April 3, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/26/2019. (wrr)
July 25, 2019 Filing 26 Copy of JPML ORDER DEEMING #8 MOTION WITHDRAWN. MDL 2910 is closed. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 7/23/2019.( Associated Cases: MDL No. 2910, DE/1:18-cv-01038, DE/1:18-cv-01040, DE/1:18-cv-01043, DE/1:19-cv-01118, WVN/1:19-cv-00128 ) (kac)
July 10, 2019 Case Stayed. (cmd)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ***SEALED***. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/10/2019. (Sealed and emailed to counsel of record per IMK.)(wrr)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STIPULATION UNDER SEAL [DKT. NO. 22 ]. The Court GRANTS the motion (Dkt. No. 22) and DIRECTS the Clerk to file the Stipulation (Dkt. No. 22-1) under seal. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/10/2019. (wrr)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned Judge, deeming himself disqualified pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), ORDERS that the above-styled civil action be transferred to and placed on the docket of the Honorable Irene M. Keeley, United States District Judge. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/9/2019 (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by William J O'Brien on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (O'Brien, William)
July 5, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed from SS as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 6/27/2019. (jmm)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Laura Corbin. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/2/2019. (wrr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to Laura Corbin: PAID $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002647. (wrr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura Corbin by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert W. Trenchard. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/1/19. (njz)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Jane M. Love. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/1/19. (njz)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to Jane M. Love and Robert W. Trenchard: PAID $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002644. (wrr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Photocopy of Amended Certificate of Service of Motion, Memorandum, Schedule of Actions filed before the USJP on Multidistrict Litigation on 6/27/2019.(wrr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Photocopy of Amended Certificate of Service of Motion to Expedite filed before the USJP on Multidistrict Litigation on 6/27/2019. (wrr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jane M. Love by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert W. Trenchard by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Companion, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Photocopy of Motion of Plaintiff For Transfer of Action to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 18 USC 1407 for Coordinated and Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed before the USJP on Multidistrict Litigation on 6/26/19. (mh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Love, Corbin and Trenchard. (mh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (mh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental Information for Patent Cases Involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (mh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (mh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400; receipt number WVNW002215. (mh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent Information, #2 Exhibit B - Patent Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Laura Corbin
Represented By: Jane M. Love
Represented By: Robert W. Trenchard
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: James F. Companion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?