Reeves v. Antonelli
Petitioner: Darnell Reeves
Respondent: Bryan M. Antonelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv00142
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Darnell Reeves. (Kornbrath, Brian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bryan M. Antonelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Johnson Declaration, #2 Attachments 1 through 10 to Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Reisenweber, Erin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Supplement Record re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Darnell Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Attachment BOP Administrative)(Kornbrath, Brian)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Warden shall have twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order, to show cause why the writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/20/19.
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 IN FORMA PAUPERIS BUT WAIVING THE $5.00 FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 7/29/19. (mh)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 4 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 7/29/19. (mh)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION REQUESTING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 7/29/19. (mh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Darnell Reeves. (mh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darnell Reeves. (mh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Emergency Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241 against Bryan M. Antonelli, filed by Darnell Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - 2/8/19 Correspondence from Krause to Redmond, #2 Attachment B - 2/11/19 Correspondence from Krause to Redmond, #3 Attachment C - District of Kansas J&C, #4 Attachment D - 2/22/19 Correspondence from Redmond to Idorest@bop.gov, #5 Attachment E - 2/26/19 Correspondence from Redmond to Idorest@bop.gov)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan M. Antonelli
Represented By: Helen Campbell Altmeyer
Represented By: Erin K. Reisenweber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darnell Reeves
Represented By: Brian J. Kornbrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?