Bowles v. CVS Pharmacy
Plaintiff: Gregory Bowles
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00154
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/28/19. (mh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice and #2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/28/2019. (dk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Roseboro Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/23/2019. (dk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy identifying Corporate Parent West Virginia CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy.. (Glyptis, Phillip)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ROSEBORO NOTICE: re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CVS Pharmacy. Within 21 days from the date of this Order, the pro se party shall file any opposition to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/20/2019. (Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff by cert. mail). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF COURT. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that said Motion #5 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/20/2019. (Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff by cert. mail) (Redacted Exhibit A attached to Notice of Removal). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Marion County Circuit Court. (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #1 Attachment State Court Document - sealed per MJA (duplicates of documents previously filed - contains personal identifiers)) (mh).
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to File Redacted Documents re #1 Notice of Removal, by CVS Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Glyptis, Phillip)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by CVS Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Glyptis, Phillip)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (To PS Plaintiff via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/12/19. (mh) (copy PS Plaintiff via. cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Marion County Circuit Court, (case number CC-24-2019-C-120), filed by CVS Pharmacy. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2877333. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Misc. Documents, (Sealed per MJA) #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #3 Redacted Exhibit A) (dk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowles v. CVS Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy
Represented By: Phillip T. Glyptis
Represented By: Robert J. Behling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?