Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc. v. 0.11 Acre, more or less, in Doddridge County, West Virginia, Located on Parcel Identification No. 09-04-10-0032-0001-0000, and being more particularly described as 19.04 acres, more or less, et al
Plaintiff: Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.
Defendant: Anthony Lake, Any Unknown Owners and 0.11 Acre, more or less, in Doddridge County, West Virginia, Located on Parcel Identification No. 0032-0001-0000, and being more particularly described as 19.04 acres, more or less
Case Number: 1:2019cv00182
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 SERVICE by Publication filed by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.. Last publication date 10/8/19. (O'Brien, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 Treasury Registry Funds per #21 Order entered on 9/30/19, paid by Dominion Energy Transmission; $ 5000.00, receipt number WVNE014537 (mh)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DKT. NO. #3 AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND IMMEDIATE POSSESSION DKT. NO. #4 . Dominion is directed to deposit funds prior to accessing and taking possession of the property. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/30/19. (Copy to financial deputy)(mh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 20 Clerk's Exhibit and Witness List for hearing held 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Ex. 1 - Plat Map, #2 Plaintiff's Ex. 2 - 6/28/19 Letter, #3 Plaintiff's Ex. 3 - FERC Certificate (Part 1), #4 Plaintiff's Ex. 3 (con't) FERC Certificate (Part 2), #5 Plaintiff's Ex. 4 - Certified Easement Agreement, #6 Plaintiff's Ex. 5 - Appraisal Report) (dk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Motion Hearing held on 9/27/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc., #3 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc. (Court Reporter Stacy Harlow) (dk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 Proof of Service (Unlocatable) Other Document re #6 Order,, Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and Social Security Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.. (O'Brien, William)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PERMIT WITNESSES TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AND ENTRY TO THE COURTHOUSE WITH ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT DKT. NO. #16 . Dominion is directed to provide a copy of this Order to the defendants and file proof of service with the Court. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/26/19. (mh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION To Permit Witnesses to Appear by Telephone and Entry to Courthouse with Electronic Equipment by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for James J. Holt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/25/19. (mh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 PHV Filing fee for James J. Holt: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002718 (mh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (James J. Holt) by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Richard D. Holzheimer, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/25/2019. (dk)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for John D. Wilburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/25/2019. (dk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to John D. Wilburn and Richard D. Holzheimer: PAID $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002715. (wrr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (John D. Wilburn) by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Richard D. Holzheimer, Jr.) by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Other Document Certificate for Service by Publication filed by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Turner, Lauren)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING MOTION HEARING re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc., #3 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2019 03:00 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/17/2019. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Dominion Energy Gas Holdings, LLC for Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc... (Turner, Lauren)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injuction, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Turner, Lauren)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Turner, Lauren)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc. Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation (Turner, Lauren)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 0.11 Acre, more or less, in Doddridge County, West Virginia, Located on Parcel Identification No. 09-04-10-0032-0001-0000, and being more particularly described as 19.04 acres, more or less, Any Unknown Owners, Anthony Lake, filed by Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2901090. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Map, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Map, #4 Exhibit 4 - Easement Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - 12/11/18 Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 6 - 6/13/19 Correspondence, #7 Exhibit 7 - 6/28/19 Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 8 - Map, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc. v. 0.11 Acre, more or less, in Doddridge County, West Virginia, Located on Parcel Identification No. 09-04-10-0032-0001-0000, and being more particularly described as 19.04 acres, more or less, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.11 Acre, more or less, in Doddridge County, West Virginia, Located on Parcel Identification No. 0032-0001-0000, and being more particularly described as 19.04 acres, more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominion Energy Transmission, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren K. Turner
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Brooks Spears
Represented By: John D Wilburn
Represented By: James J. Holt
Represented By: Richard D. Holzheimer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?