Ayodele v. Hudgins et al
Plaintiff: Quadiri Ayodele
Defendant: AUSA Flowers, AW Messer, Warden Hudgins and SIS VanDevender
Case Number: 1:2019cv00183
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #13 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/8/2019. (jmm)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONSTRUING MOTION FOR ABEYANCE AS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, GRANTING THE SAME, AND RE-SETTING TIME granting #11 Motion. Plaintiff has up to and including December 6, 2019 in which to respond to the deficiency notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/6/2019. (Copy Pro Se Plaintiff via cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from Deputy Clerk to Quadori Ayodele regarding #11 MOTION filed by Quadiri Ayodele. (jmm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION To Hold Case in Abeyance by Quadiri Ayodele. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/28/2019. (jmm)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff will show cause within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order why his case should not be dismissed for the failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/24/2019 (Copy Pro Se Plaintiff via certified mail). (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CORRECT NATURE OF SUIT AND CAUSE OF ACTION AND ISSUE DEFICIENCY NOTICE #6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/26/2019. (jmm)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice Of General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/23/2019 per USPS ebsite. (jmm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #5 Order. (copy with Bivens packet via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #1 Bivens Packet) (jmm). (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/23/2019 corrected form) (jmm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CORRECT NATURE OF SUIT AND CAUSE OF ACTION AND ISSUE DEFICIENCY NOTICE. The Clerk is directed to correct the nature of the suit and cause of action to reflect that the complaint is a Bivens action, and send the petitioner a Notice of Deficient Pleading and the Court-approved form packet for filing a Bivens civil rights action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/23/2019 (copy via certified mail). (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court as to Quadiri Ayodele. (copy via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Quadiri Ayodele. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Letter to the Trust Fund, #3 Envelope)(jmm) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/19/2019 with correct document) (jmm).
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Quadiri Ayodele. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/19/2019 with correct document) (jmm).
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Flowers, Hudgins, Messer, VanDevender, filed by Quadiri Ayodele. (Attachments: #1 Attachment FCI Gilmer Special Housing Unit Shopping List, #2 Envelope)(jmm) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/19/2019 with correct document) (jmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayodele v. Hudgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSA Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AW Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIS VanDevender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quadiri Ayodele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?