Newman v. Antonelli
Defendant: Warden Antonelli
Petitioner: Praylor Newman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00186
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION OF PRAYLOR NEWMAN IN SUPPORT OF #1 Petition, filed by Praylor Newman. Declaration appears to be duplicate of Declaration attached to #5 MEMORANDUM and #11 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Transcripts, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Copy of #7 Order, #4 Letter to clerk/Copy of envelope from clerk, #5 Envelope)(Declaration received by clerk's office with signature page missing.)(wrr)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Praylor Newman. Memorandum appears to be duplicate of #5 Memorandum and #10 Memorandum (with exception of missing signature page.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 Third Duplicate MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Praylor Newman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Motion appears to be duplicate of #4 and #9 motions filed by petitioner.) (wrr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE A COMPLETE COPY OF DECLARATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/3/2019. (wrr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Praylor Newman enclosing public docket sheet and filed-stamped first pages of #9 Motion, #10 Memorandum, and #11 Declaration, pursuant to request in letter from Praylor Newman requesting proof of filing. Returned in SASE submitted with filings. (wrr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration of Praylor Newman in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Praylor Newman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Letter to clerk, #3 Envelope)(wrr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 Second MEMORANDUM of Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Praylor Newman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Envelope)(wrr) Modified on 10/9/2019 to correct docket text (wrr). (Received by clerk's office with no signature page.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Praylor Newman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Letter to clerk, #3 Envelope)(wrr)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se, #3 ORDER NOTING PETITIONER'S FAILURE TO ATTACH MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE THE SAME, SHOULD HE CHOOSE TO DO SO. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/27/2019. (wrr)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE A COMPLETE COPY OF DECLARATION. Should Petitioner wish the Court to consider the Declaration attached to his memorandum, he must file a complete copy of the same within fourteen days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/30/2019. (Copy to PS Petitioner via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Paperless Notice: Filing fee of $5.00 paid in case 1:19cv176 to be applied to new case 1:19cv186 pursuant to Order Dismissing Case Following Notice of Intent to Dismiss entered on September 26, 2019. Copy mailed to PS petitioner. (wrr)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Praylor Newman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Praylor Newman in Support of 28 U.S.C. 2241, #2 Attachment, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Letter to Clerk, #5 Envelope)(wrr)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Praylor Newman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Letter to clerk, #3 Envelope)(wrr)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER NOTING PETITIONER'S FAILURE TO ATTACH MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE THE SAME, SHOULD HE CHOOSE TO DO SO. Petitioner shall have 21 days from the date of this Order to file a memorandum in support of his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/24/2019. (Copy to PS petitioner via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (wrr)(Copy to PS Petitioner via CM, RRR.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Antonelli, filed by Praylor Newman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr) Modified on 9/24/2019 to correct filing date(wrr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Praylor Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?