Kempker v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Scott Francis Kempker
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00198
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from Scott Kempker to Judge Kleeh. (Public Docket Sheet sent to Petitioner) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from Scott Kempker to Judge Kleeh. (Attachments: #1 Email, #2 Administrative Claim Acknowledgment Letter, #3 Envelope). (Filed as letter per Chambers)(mh)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/25/2019. (jmm) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/4/2019 to correct stamp file date) (jmm).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING LETTER MOTION FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL re #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/20/2019. (Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff by cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER/ MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL by Scott Francis Kempker. (Attachments: #1 11/5/19 Letter from Matthew W. Mellady, #2 Envelope)(filed pursuant to #9 Order in Civil Case 5:19-cv-302) (lmm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/1/2019. (wrr)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice Of General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/28/2019. (jmm)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #2 . It is hereby ORDERED that: Initial partial filing fee of 20.83 paid to US District Court Clerk office. If the Plaintiff fails to pay the initial filing fee within twenty-eight (28) days of the entry of this Order, the Court will DISMISS this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/29/2019 (copy of order to pro se plaintiff via certified mail, Copy of order and Consent to Collection to financial Deputy Clerk and Trustee Clerk of institution having custody of Plaintiff via US mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court (copy via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Scott Francis Kempker. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope). (jmm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Scott Francis Kempker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Scott Francis Kempker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Scott Francis Kempker. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Claim # TRT-MXR-2019-06646, #2 Claim 1 Attachment, #3 Attachment Claim 1 "A", #4 Attachment Claim 2, #5 Attachment Claim 2 "A", #6 Attachment Injury, #7 Miscellaneous documents, #8 Medical Records, #9 Letter to Court, #10 Envelope)(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kempker v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Francis Kempker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?