Calhoun v. Sandbox Transportation, LLC
Plaintiff: Tommy Calhoun, Jr.
Defendant: Sandbox Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00215
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER extending the deadline to file the Rule 26 Meeting Report to 2/7/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 1/31/20. (sg)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Sandbox Transportation, LLC.(Johnson, Andrea)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Case reassigned to District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/17/2019. (dk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Sandbox Transportation, LLC. (Johnson, Andrea)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sandbox Transportation, LLC identifying Corporate Parent U.S. SILICA HOLDINGS, INC. for Sandbox Transportation, LLC.. (Johnson, Andrea)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court Of Monongalia County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A Notice Of Removal) (jmm)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 1/15/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/29/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2020 02:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 2/20/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/5/19. (mh)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Monongalia County Circuit Court, (case number 19-C-336), filed by Sandbox Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notices, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun v. Sandbox Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandbox Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Andrea J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Calhoun, Jr.
Represented By: D. Adrian Hoosier, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?