Celgene Corporation v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Celgene Corporation
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Inc. and Mylan, N.V.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00003
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 20 Mail sent to Eric C. Stops #6 Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission Returned as Undeliverable. Unable to Forward. (wrr)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Eric Stops. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/15/2020. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Cary Miller. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/15/2020 (Copy counsel of Record) (jmm)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew Chalson. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/15/2020 (Copy counsel of record) (jmm)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney F. Dominic Cerrito. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/15/2020. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony M. Insogna. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/15/2020 (copy counsel of record) (jmm)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew J. Hertko. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/15/2020 (copy counsel of record) (jmm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 1,200.00, receipt number WVNC002835, for attorneys M. Hertko, A. Insogna, C. Miller, F. Cerrito, A. Chalson and E. Stops. (jmm) Modified on 1/15/2020 (jmm).
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric Stops by Celgene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Chalson by Celgene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of F. Dominic Cerrito by Celgene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Cary Miller by Celgene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony M. Insogna by Celgene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Hertko by Celgene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Anthony M. Insogna, Cary Miller, F. Dominic Cerrito, Matthew J. Hertko (Attachments: #1 Attorney Andrew Chalson, #2 Eric Stops)(sent via US mail)(jmm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celgene Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Bristol-Myers Squibb Company for Celgene Corporation. (jmm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FOR PATENT CASES INVOLVING AN ABBREVIATED NEW DRUG APPLICATION (ANDA)filed by Celgene Corporation. (jmm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (jmm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002352. (jmm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan, N.V., filed by Celgene Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B 1, #3 Exhibit B 2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celgene Corporation v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celgene Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. Hertko
Represented By: Cary Miller, Ph.D
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Eric C. Stops
Represented By: Andrew S. Chalson
Represented By: F. Dominic Cerrito
Represented By: Anthony M. Insogna
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: Cary Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?