Spatafore et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: John A. Spatafore and Beverly J. Spatafore
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Personal Care Products Council and Johnson & Johnson
In Re: Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00021
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-198) - 3 action(s) re: pldg. ( 2184 in MDL No. 2738, 1 in NYS/1:19-cv-08665, 1 in NYW/1:20-cv-00181, 1 in WVN/1:20-cv-00021) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted and these actions are transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 2/21/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2738, NYS/1:19-cv-08665, NYW/1:20-cv-00181, WVN/1:20-cv-00021. (jmm)
February 26, 2020 Case Transfer Complete - Case transferred to New Jersey on 2/26/2020. New Jersey's case number is 3:20cv2076. (wrr)
February 26, 2020 Case transferred to District of New Jersey re MDL 2738. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (jmm)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Personal Care Products Council by Beverly J. Spatafore, John A. Spatafore. (Amos, C.)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John A. Spatafore, Beverly J. Spatafore. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2984751. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spatafore et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Spatafore
Represented By: Jason P. Foster
Represented By: Scott S. Segal
Represented By: C. Edward Amos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly J. Spatafore
Represented By: Jason P. Foster
Represented By: Scott S. Segal
Represented By: C. Edward Amos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personal Care Products Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?