Frontier West Virginia, Inc. v. Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO Local Union 2011
Plaintiff: Frontier West Virginia, Inc.
Defendant: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO Local Union 2011
Case Number: 1:2020cv00035
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Case Stayed Pending Bankruptcy Proceeding. (jmm)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Frontier West Virginia, Inc. of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy for Frontier Communications Corporation, et al., and Automatic Stay of These Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Richard)
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 Amended MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Frontier West Virginia, Inc.. (Wallace, Richard)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award by Frontier West Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wallace, Richard)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Petition/Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, and Amended Complaint by Frontier West Virginia, Inc.. (Wallace, Richard)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO Local Union 2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Transcript, #5 Memorandum of Law, #6 Certificate of Service)(Trivelli, Vincent)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OROTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendant may respond to Complaint is hereby extended from March 19, 2020 to April 2, 2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/18/2020. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Additional Time to Answer by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO Local Union 2011. (Trivelli, Vincent)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO Local Union 2011 served on 2/28/2020. (Wallace, Richard)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frontier West Virginia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Frontier Communications Corporation for Frontier West Virginia, Inc... (Wallace, Richard)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO VACATE and Memorandum of Law in Support of Frontier West Virginia Inc.'s Petition and Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award by Frontier West Virginia, Inc. . (Wallace, Richard) Modified on 2/28/2020 Attorney used wrong event. Deputy Clerk corrected the event and regen NEF. (cmd)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND PETITION/MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD against Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO Local Union 2011, filed by Frontier West Virginia, Inc. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2999210 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Proceedings, #2 Exhibit B - General Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Code of Business document, #4 Exhibit D - Human Resources document, #5 Exhibit E - Transcript, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frontier West Virginia, Inc. v. Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO Local Union 2011
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frontier West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay M. Gainer
Represented By: Richard M Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO Local Union 2011
Represented By: Vincent M. Trivelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?