Rundle et al v. Vessel et al
Plaintiff: Amy Rundle and Todd Rundle
Defendant: Donald R. Weatherspoon and Joseph Vessel, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00044
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court dismisses this civil action without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 4/6/20. (mh)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amy Rundle, Todd Rundle (Brennan, Julie)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Joseph Vessel, Jr, Donald R. Weatherspoon re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction . (Lockhart, Robert)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Joseph Vessel, Jr, Donald R. Weatherspoon. (Lockhart, Robert)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Exhibit 3 Other Document re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Joseph Vessel, Jr, Donald R. Weatherspoon. (Lockhart, Robert)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Marion County. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dk)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 5/5/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/19/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2020, 1:00 PM, in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 6/9/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/12/2020. (dk)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marion County, (case number 20-C-31), filed by Joseph Vessel, Jr., Donald R. Weatherspoon, and Donald R. Weatherspoon dba Weatherspoon Hauling. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-3007932. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Papers, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of NOR, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rundle et al v. Vessel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Rundle
Represented By: Julie A. Brennan
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Rundle
Represented By: Julie A. Brennan
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Weatherspoon
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Represented By: Robert A. Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Vessel, Jr.
Represented By: Allison M. Subacz
Represented By: Robert A. Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?