Drayton v. Six Unknown Federal Narcotice Agents
Plaintiff: Hezekiah B. Drayton
Defendant: Six Unknown Federal Narcotice Agents
Case Number: 1:2020cv00051
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CONSTRUING PLAINTIFF'S LETTER MOTION TO STAY CASE AS LETTER MOTION FOR A SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH DEFICIENCY NOTICE AND GRANTING THE SAME. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 5/6/2020. (Copy to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO STAY CASE pending lifting of BOP restrictions by Hezekiah B. Drayton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MCR Inmate Bulletin, #2 Envelope)(wrr)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 ORDER CONSTRUING PLAINTIFF'S #8 LETTER AS A LETTER MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH DEFICIENCY NOTICE. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/21/2020. (wrr)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CONSTRUING PLAINTIFF'S #8 LETTER AS A LETTER MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH DEFICIENCY NOTICE. Plaintiff's letter is CONSTRUED as a letter motion for an extension of time in which to reply to the Court's March 24, 2020 Notice of Deficient Pleading [ECF No. #4 ], and for good causeshown, Plaintiff's letter motion [ECF No. #8 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff may have up to and including May 20, 2020, in which to file his Bivens and FTCA complaints in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/16/2020. (Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Hezekiah B. Drayton regarding #9 Letter. (wrr) (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/15/2020 with corrected document) (wrr).
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Hezekiah B. Drayton regarding #8 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Bivens packet)(wrr)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION/LETTER from Hezekiah B. Drayton to Clerk of Court regarding complying with #2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 MCR Inmate Bulletin, #2 Envelope)(wrr) Modified on 4/15/2020 to change to motion event.
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Order, #5 Notice of General Guidelines, #4 Notice of Deficient Pleading. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/27/2020, per USPS. (wrr)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/23/2020. (wrr)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (wrr)(Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING, per #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 Bivens packet, #2 FTCA packet)(Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR with Bivens and FTCA packets.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO DISREGARD NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS, DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE DEFICIENCY NOTICE AND SEND PLAINTIFFBOTH BIVENS AND FEDERAL TORT CLAIM ACT COMPLAINTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 3/24/2020. (Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #2 Bivens packet) (wrr).
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Six Unknown Federal Narcotice Agents, filed by Hezekiah B. Drayton. (Attachments: #1 USDOJ memorandum regarding institutional lockdown, #2 USDOJ memorandum regarding administrative claim, #3 Envelope)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drayton v. Six Unknown Federal Narcotice Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hezekiah B. Drayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Unknown Federal Narcotice Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?