Love v. USA
Petitioner: Darmatrice Love
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00069
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/4/2020 (per USPS website). (dk) Modified to add docket text on 5/8/2020 (dk).
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME (DKT. NO. #5 ). The Petitioner is ordered to refile his 2255 motion on court-approved forms no later than 6/30/20. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 4/29/20. (mh) (Copy Petitioner via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File 2255 Motion on Court approved forms by Darmatrice Love. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice and #2 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/20/20. (mh)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficient Pleading. (Attachments: #1 2255 Forms)(mh) (To Petitioner via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (To Petitioner via cert mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Darmatrice Love. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darmatrice Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Zelda E. Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?