Butcher et al v. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Butcher and Justin Butcher
Defendant: Safety Management Systems, LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. and Antero Resources Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00074
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE by Jennifer Butcher, Justin Butcher of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt Card, #2 Exhibit Original Subpoena)(McQueen, James)
June 16, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File TO FILE SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM by Jennifer Butcher, Justin Butcher. (Heavens, Christopher)
June 16, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by Jennifer Butcher, Justin Butcher of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(McQueen, James)
June 16, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by Jennifer Butcher, Justin Butcher of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McQueen, James)
June 11, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Ftemkos J. Yianne on behalf of Safety Management Systems, LLC (Yianne, Ftemkos)
June 11, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Jennifer Butcher, Justin Butcher of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(McQueen, James)
June 10, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ("HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.'S REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS") filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Van Volkenburg, Jeffrey)
June 9, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Rule 12(b)(6) ("REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ANTERO RESOURCES CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS") filed by Antero Resources Corporation. (Van Volkenburg, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Attorneys Christopher A. Brumley and Jordan Vincent Palmer terminated for Antero Resources Corporation, Attorneys Varner, Van Volkenburg and Varner and the firm of Varner & Van Volkenburg, PLLC are added for Antero Resources Corporation. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/8/20. (mh)
June 5, 2020 Filing 24 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Counsel re #22 Stipulation by Antero Resources Corporation. (Palmer, Jordan)
June 3, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jennifer Butcher, Justin Butcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit, #4 Exhibit Exhibit, #5 Exhibit Exhibit, #6 Exhibit Exhibit, #7 Exhibit Exhibit, #8 Exhibit Exhibit, #9 Exhibit Exhibit)(McQueen, James) Modified on 6/5/2020 to Seal Exhibits 3 and 6 per Chambers (contain personal identifiers) (dk).
June 3, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Antero Resources Corporation. (Palmer, Jordan)
June 2, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Jennifer Butcher, Justin Butcher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Heavens, Christopher)
May 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Jennifer Butcher, Justin Butcher of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Subpoena, #4 Exhibit Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Subpoena)(McQueen, James) Modified to Seal Exhibit 2 per Chambers on 5/29/2029 (contains personal identifiers) (dk).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 5/27/2020. (copy counsel of record) (jmm)
May 26, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Protective Order Other Document filed by Safety Management Systems, LLC. (Mannion, Thomas) Modified to add docket text on 5/27/2020 (dk).
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Halliburton Company, Other Affiliate Halliburton Holdings LLC for Halliburton Energy Services, Inc... (Van Volkenburg, Jeffrey)
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Antero Resources Corporation. (Palmer, Jordan)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 6/22/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/6/2020. Discovery due by 7/22/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 5/21/2020. (dk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Safety Management Systems, LLC.(Mannion, Thomas)
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safety Management Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acadian Ambulance Service for Safety Management Systems, LLC.. (Mannion, Thomas)
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Van Volkenburg, Jeffrey)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 6/3/2020) by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Van Volkenburg, Jeffrey)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support by Antero Resources Corporation re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Rule 12(b)(6) . (Palmer, Jordan)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Rule 12(b)(6) by Antero Resources Corporation. (Palmer, Jordan)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Antero Resources Corporation served on 4/29/2020. (mh)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. served on 4/29/2020. (mh)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Safety Management Systems, LLC served on 4/29/2020. (mh)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 Modification of Attorney Contact Information by James D. McQueen, Jr. (dk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Justin Butcher, Jennifer Butcher. Filing Fee Paid $400 - Receipt #0424-3030611. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butcher et al v. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Management Systems, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Mannion
Represented By: Ftemkos J. Yianne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Tedeschi Varner
Represented By: Jeffrey D Van Volkenburg
Represented By: James A Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Represented By: Christopher A. Brumley
Represented By: Debra Tedeschi Varner
Represented By: Jordan Vincent Palmer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Van Volkenburg
Represented By: James A Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Butcher
Represented By: James D. McQueen, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher J. Heavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Butcher
Represented By: James D. McQueen, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher J. Heavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?