Pratt v. Warden SFF Hazelton
Petitioner: Daphine Pratt
Respondent: Warden SFF Hazelton
Case Number: 1:2020cv00204
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/24/2020. (dk)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/22/2020. (Copy to PS Petitioner by cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice of General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/20/2020 (per USPS website). (dk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 2241 Forms)(mh) (To PS Petitioner via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241 First Step Act against Warden SFF Hazelton, filed by Daphine Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Misc. Documents, #2 Envelope)(mh) Copy USPO Wilkinson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. Warden SFF Hazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden SFF Hazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daphine Pratt
Represented By: Brian J. Kornbrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?