Metro Towers, LLC v. Duff et al
Plaintiff: Metro Towers, LLC
Defendant: Michael C. Duff and Barbara C. Ludlow
Case Number: 1:2020cv00206
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2020. Defendant Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 1/4/2021. Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Motions due by 5/28/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/26/2021. Final Pretrial Conference and Settlement Conference set for 8/5/2021 02:30 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Selection set for 8/24/2021 09:30 AM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Trial set for three days beginning 8/24/2021 09:30 AM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/9/2020. (wrr)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kepple, Mark)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court Of Monongalia County. (jmm)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael C. Duff, Barbara C. Ludlow.(Hayes, Seth)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Michael C. Duff, Barbara C. Ludlow of Errata of Notice of Removal (Hayes, Seth)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/21/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/5/2020. Discovery due by 10/21/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/19/2020. (wrr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 PAPERLESS NOTICE. Case filing began in CM/ECF shell case, with filing fee being paid through pay.gov (Receipt #0424-3097045) on August 17, 2020. However, filer failed to complete filing process following receipt of payment. Clerk's Office notified filer of incomplete filing and the Notice of Removal was received on August 18, 2020 in the shell case. (wrr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, WV, (case number 20-C-13), filed by Michael C. Duff, Barbara C. Ludlow.Filing Fee $400 paid on 08/17/2020 Receipt #0424-3097045. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metro Towers, LLC v. Duff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Towers, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Kepple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Duff
Represented By: Seth P Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara C. Ludlow
Represented By: Seth P Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?