Posey et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Kristina Hinzman and Russell Posey, II
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00208
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 Verified Petition for Approval of Settlement Other Document filed by Kristina Hinzman, Russell Posey, II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Tony)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Westfall, Fred)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled civil action be transferred to and placed on the docket of the Honorable Thomas S. Kleeh, District Judge. Case reassigned to District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/24/2020. (wrr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Russell Posey, II, Kristina Hinzman.Filing Fee $400 PAID. Receipt #0424-3099043. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Posey et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Hinzman
Represented By: Cheryl A. Fisher
Represented By: Tony L. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Posey, II
Represented By: Cheryl A. Fisher
Represented By: Tony L. O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Fred B. Westfall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?