Cappellari v. Sparks et al
Plaintiff: Katherine E. Cappellari and Kayde Cappellari
Defendant: Bruce Sparks, West Virginia University Research Corporation and West Virginia University
Case Number: 1:2020cv00209
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/5/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/19/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in Magistrate Judge Aloi Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Discovery due by 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/3/20. (Attachments: #1 First Order Attachment)(jss)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/27/20 per USPS website. (jss)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Bruce Sparks, West Virginia University, West Virginia University Research Corporation.(Moore, Julie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Monongalia County. (jss)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/21/20. (njz) Copy mailed to pro se pla via cert return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, (case number 20-C-212), filed by West Virginia University Research Corporation, Bruce Sparks, West Virginia University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3100771(njz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cappellari v. Sparks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine E. Cappellari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayde Cappellari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Sparks
Represented By: Pamela J. Ferrell
Represented By: Julie A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia University Research Corporation
Represented By: Pamela J. Ferrell
Represented By: Julie A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia University
Represented By: Pamela J. Ferrell
Represented By: Julie A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?