Thompson v. Warden
Petitioner: Griffin A. Thompson
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 1:2020cv00218
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/24/2020. (wrr)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOLLOWING NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. Pursuant to the terms of the Notice, this action is hereby DISMISSED and all matters relating to Thompson's 2241 petition shall proceed in Civil Action No. 5:20cv203.The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Petitioner's pending motion for appointed counsel [ECF No. #4 ] and to apply the filing fee Thompson paid in this case to Case No. 5:20cv203. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/22/2020. (Copy to PS petitioner via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/15/2020, per USPS. (wrr)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Griffin A. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (2241 Court-Approved Form Petition enclosed.) (Attachments: #1 2241 Court-Approved Form Petition)(wrr) (Mailed to PS Petitioner via CM, RRR.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee PAID: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC003016. (wrr)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden, filed by Griffin A. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Griffin A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?