CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Caloccia et al
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Virginia Christafore, Nancy Duda and Rebecca Caloccia
Case Number: 1:2020cv00224
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy Duda served on 10/21/2020. (Bird, Melissa)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Virginia Christafore served on 10/17/2020. (Bird, Melissa)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rebecca Caloccia served on 10/21/2020. (Bird, Melissa)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Jeffrey D. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/22/2020. (dk)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Timothy L. Frey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/22/2020. (dk)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received for T. Frey and J. Cohen: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC003023. (dk)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Application of Timothy Frey for pro hac vice Other Document filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Admitting Timothy Frey pro hac vice)(Bird, Melissa) Modified on 9/21/2020 Attorney used wrong event. Corrected to motion (cmd).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application for Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey Cohen for CSX Other Document filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Jeffrey Cohen pro hac vice)(Bird, Melissa) Modified on 9/21/2020 Attorney used wrong event. Corrected to motion event. (cmd).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc... (Bird, Melissa)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Cohen and Frey. (mh)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3113704. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Caloccia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Christafore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Duda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Caloccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy L. Frey
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Cohen
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Represented By: Alexander Chesney Frampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?