AJE Enterprise LLC et al v. Justice et al
Plaintiff: B.F. Uglys Zach Traugh doing business as Big Times, Sar Tech LLC, Cecelias Joe Blodgett doing business as Joe Mama's, Mountain Mamas Hot Spot LLC, Caribba Foods, LLC Bron Kayal doing business as Crab Shack Caribba and Dockside Grille, AJE Enterprise LLC Adam Ereditario doing business as Whisper Night Club and Lounge, Extensive Enterprises, Rag G Scorers Ray Glymph doing business as Scorers, Baby Squirrels, LLC Travis Tracy doing business as Baby Squirrels Saloon, BITS LLC Briana Weisen doing business as Fat Daddy's, DRD2 LLC Danielle Dufalla doing business as Almost Heaven Bar & Grill, Ray G 4th and Goal Ray Glymph doing business as 4th & Goal, Mountain Mamas Tavern LLC, JL3 LLC Chris Hare doing business as The Annex, SHC LLC, Alias Enterprises LLC, Nut Club LLC, Ray G Scorers Ray Glymph doing business as Scorers and Cecelia's Joe Blodgett doing business as Joe Mama's
Defendant: Interim City Manager Emily Muzzarelli, James Justice, Frederic L. Wooten, The City of Morgantown and Emily Muzzarelli
Case Number: 1:2020cv00229
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by AJE Enterprise LLC for proceedings held on 10/20/2020 before Judge Bailey. (ck)
November 11, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 201 filed by Emily Muzzarelli, The City of Morgantown. (Hoblitzell, John)
November 10, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 201 filed by James Justice, Frederic L. Wooten. (Bailey, Benjamin)
November 2, 2020 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by The City of Morgantown for proceedings held on 10/20/2020 before Judge Bailey. (ck)
November 2, 2020 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/20/2020, before Judge Bailey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Knecht, Telephone number 304.234.3968. Parties have five business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will become available via PACER to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. Redaction Request due 11/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (ck)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/27/20. (jss)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #24 Motion to Certify Question. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/27/20. (jss)
October 27, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 201 by AJE Enterprise LLC, Alias Enterprises LLC, B.F. Uglys, BITS LLC, Baby Squirrels, LLC, Caribba Foods, LLC, Cecelia's, DRD2 LLC, Extensive Enterprises, JL3 LLC, Mountain Mamas Hot Spot LLC, Mountain Mamas Tavern LLC, Nut Club LLC, Ray G 4th and Goal, Ray G Scorers, SHC LLC, Sar Tech LLC. (Sheehan, Martin)
October 26, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by AJE Enterprise LLC, Alias Enterprises LLC, B.F. Uglys, BITS LLC, Baby Squirrels, LLC, Caribba Foods, LLC, Cecelia's, DRD2 LLC, Extensive Enterprises, JL3 LLC, Mountain Mamas Hot Spot LLC, Mountain Mamas Tavern LLC, Nut Club LLC, Ray G 4th and Goal, Ray G Scorers, SHC LLC, Sar Tech LLC . (Sheehan, Martin)
October 26, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Certify Question Pursuant to W.Va. Code 51-1A-1, et seq. by AJE Enterprise LLC, Alias Enterprises LLC, B.F. Uglys, BITS LLC, Baby Squirrels, LLC, Caribba Foods, LLC, Cecelia's, DRD2 LLC, Extensive Enterprises, JL3 LLC, Mountain Mamas Hot Spot LLC, Mountain Mamas Tavern LLC, Nut Club LLC, Ray G 4th and Goal, Ray G Scorers, SHC LLC, Sar Tech LLC. (Sheehan, Martin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 23 Clerk's Witness and Exhibit List: Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1, Part a, Executive Orders, #(2) Exhibit 1, Part b, #(3) Exhibit 1, Part c, #(4) Exhibit 2 Management & Personnel, Chapter 2, #(5) Exhibit 3 Sales Listing for Joe Mamas, #(6) Exhibit 4 Sales Listing for Big Times, #(7) Exhibit 19 Declaration of Dr. Smith, #(8) Exhibit 21 Photo of white board, #(9) Exhibit 22 List of Covid-19 cases)(bjt)
October 20, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. A Motion Hearing for Preliminary Injunction was held before District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/20/2020 re #7 MOTION for Hearing re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter Cindy Knecht.) (bjt)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; PAPERLESS ORDER re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Responsive Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by The City of Morgantown. The Court notes said Responsive Memorandum has been filed and docketed at [Doc. 19]. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/20/2020. (eh)
October 19, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by James Justice, Frederic L. Wooten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH)(Bailey, Benjamin)
October 19, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The City of Morgantown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20)(Simonton, Ryan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Responsive Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by The City of Morgantown. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Defendants City of Morgantown and Muzzarelli's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20)(Simonton, Ryan)
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Hogan on behalf of Frederic L. Wooten (Hogan, Benjamin)
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Hogan on behalf of James Justice (Hogan, Benjamin)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin L. Bailey on behalf of Frederic L. Wooten (Bailey, Benjamin)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin L. Bailey on behalf of James Justice (Bailey, Benjamin)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING HEARING: This matter for hearing onplaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. #6 on October20, 2020, at2:0O p.m., in theWheeling District Judge Courtroom, North, before Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/14/20. (jss)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Hoblitzell on behalf of Emily Muzzarelli, The City of Morgantown (Hoblitzell, John)
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Simonton on behalf of Emily Muzzarelli, The City of Morgantown (Simonton, Ryan)
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emily Muzzarelli. (Simonton, Ryan)
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The City of Morgantown. (Simonton, Ryan)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Case reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey for all further proceedings. District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/6/20. (njz)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Statement of Counsel by AJE Enterprise LLC, Alias Enterprises LLC, B.F. Uglys, BITS LLC, Baby Squirrels, LLC, Caribba Foods, LLC, Cecelia's, DRD2 LLC, Extensive Enterprises, JL3 LLC, Mountain Mamas Hot Spot LLC, Mountain Mamas Tavern LLC, Nut Club LLC, Ray G 4th and Goal, Ray G Scorers, SHC LLC, Sar Tech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sheehan, Martin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AJE Enterprise LLC, Alias Enterprises LLC, B.F. Uglys, BITS LLC, Baby Squirrels, LLC, Caribba Foods, LLC, Cecelia's, DRD2 LLC, Extensive Enterprises, JL3 LLC, Mountain Mamas Hot Spot LLC, Mountain Mamas Tavern LLC, Nut Club LLC, Ray G 4th and Goal, Ray G Scorers, SHC LLC, Sar Tech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sheehan, Martin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Caribba Foods, LLC, Baby Squirrels, LLC, Mountain Mamas Tavern LLC, Ray G 4th and Goal, AJE Enterprise LLC, Sar Tech LLC, Mountain Mamas Hot Spot LLC, Cecelia's, BITS LLC, B.F. Uglys, Extensive Enterprises, JL3 LLC, Rag G Scorers, SHC LLC, DRD2 LLC, Nut Club LLC, Alias Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sheehan, Martin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Martin P. Sheehan (Sheehan, Martin)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002557 (jss)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Justice, Emily Muzzarelli, The City of Morgantown, Frederic L. Wooten filed by Caribba Foods, LLC, Baby Squirrels, LLC, Mountain Mamas Tavern LLC, Ray G 4th and Goal, AJE Enterprise LLC, Sar Tech LLC, Mountain Mamas Hot Spot LLC, Cecelia's, BITS LLC, B.F. Uglys, Extensive Enterprises, JL3 LLC, Rag G Scorers, SHC LLC, DRD2 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A PROCLAMATION By the Governor, #2 Exhibit 2-A PROCLAMATION By the Governor, #3 Exhibit 3-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 2-20, #4 Exhibit 4-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 3-20, #5 Exhibit 5-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 6-20, #6 Exhibit 6-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 8-20, #7 Exhibit 7-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 9-20, #8 Exhibit 8-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 16-20, #9 Exhibit 9-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 20-20, #10 Exhibit 10-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 21-20)(njz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #11 Exhibit 11-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 22-20, #12 Exhibit 12-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 24-20, #13 Exhibit 13-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 25-20, #14 Exhibit 14-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 28-20, #15 Exhibit 15-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 29-20, #16 Exhibit 16-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 30-20, #17 Exhibit 17-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 32-20, #18 Exhibit 18-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 33-20, #19 Exhibit 19-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 34-20, #20 Exhibit 20-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 36-20) (njz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #21 Exhibit 21-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 37-20, #22 Exhibit 22-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 38-20, #23 Exhibit 23-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 39-20, #24 Exhibit 24-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 40-20, #25 Exhibit 25-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 41-20, #26 Exhibit 26-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 42-20, #27 Exhibit 27-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 43-20, #28 Exhibit 28-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 44-20, #29 Exhibit 29-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 45-20, #30 Exhibit 30-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 49-20) (njz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2020: #31 Exhibit 31-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 51-20, #32 Exhibit 32-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 52-20, #33 Exhibit 33-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 55-20, #34 Exhibit 34-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 58-20, #35 Exhibit 35-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 60-20, #36 Exhibit 36-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 62-20, #37 Exhibit 37-EXECUTIVE ORDER NO. 65-20, #38 Exhibit 38- Correspondence 3/18/20, #39 Exhibit 39-Emergency Ordinance No. 2020-5, #40 Civil Cover Sheet) (njz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AJE Enterprise LLC et al v. Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.F. Uglys Zach Traugh doing business as Big Times
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sar Tech LLC
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecelias Joe Blodgett doing business as Joe Mama's
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Mamas Hot Spot LLC
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caribba Foods, LLC Bron Kayal doing business as Crab Shack Caribba and Dockside Grille
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJE Enterprise LLC Adam Ereditario doing business as Whisper Night Club and Lounge
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Extensive Enterprises
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rag G Scorers Ray Glymph doing business as Scorers
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baby Squirrels, LLC Travis Tracy doing business as Baby Squirrels Saloon
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BITS LLC Briana Weisen doing business as Fat Daddy's
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DRD2 LLC Danielle Dufalla doing business as Almost Heaven Bar & Grill
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray G 4th and Goal Ray Glymph doing business as 4th & Goal
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Mamas Tavern LLC
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JL3 LLC Chris Hare doing business as The Annex
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHC LLC
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alias Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nut Club LLC
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray G Scorers Ray Glymph doing business as Scorers
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecelia's Joe Blodgett doing business as Joe Mama's
Represented By: Martin P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interim City Manager Emily Muzzarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Justice
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Benjamin J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederic L. Wooten
Represented By: Benjamin L. Bailey
Represented By: Benjamin J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Morgantown
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Simonton
Represented By: John R. Hoblitzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Muzzarelli
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Simonton
Represented By: John R. Hoblitzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?