White v. Jividen
Plaintiff: Jayson Bradley White
Defendant: Betsy C. Jividen
Intervenor Plaintiff: Jeremy Salisbury and Jamie Hicks
Case Number: 1:2020cv00269
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 22 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamie Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental In Forma Pauperis Form)(jss)
February 4, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Counsel /Guardian Ad Litem by Jamie Hicks. (jss)
February 4, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Joinder/to Intervene by Jamie Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jss)
February 3, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Subpoena of Records by Jayson Bradley White. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Judicial Investigation Commision, #2 Envelope, #3 Cover Letter (copy of docket sheet mailed))(jss)
January 27, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Subpoena of Cert Records/Related Materials by Jayson Bradley White. (Attachments: #1 Memo to Braxton County Circuit Court, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)(jss)
January 27, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Judiciary Investigation by Jayson Bradley White. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(jss)
January 21, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER from Jayson B. White to Clerk. (sent copy of docket sheet and attachments B, C and D) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)
January 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION /Affirmation of Adjudgment/Compliance Order by Jayson Bradley White. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter (copy of docket sheet mailed), #2 Envelope)(jss)
January 12, 2021 Filing 14 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Salisbury. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental In Forma Pauperis Form, #2 Ledger Sheets, #3 3 Month Average Balance)(jss)
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene and/or MOTION for Joinder by Jeremy Salisbury. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(jss)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 Pro Se MOTION: Evidence/Affidavit Submission by Jayson Bradley White. (njz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2021: #1 Open Subpoena of Records, #2 Document Subpoena, #3 Document Subpoena #2, #4 Correspondence, #5 Manifesto of the Poor, #6 Addendum 1: Manifesto of the Poor, #7 Addendum 2: Manifesto of the Poor, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Envelope) (njz).
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER from Jayson B. White to Clerk Cheryl Dean Riley requesting docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz) docket sheet mailed via regular mail
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Financial Injunction by Jayson Bradley White. (Attachments: #1 Misc. Document, #2 Misc. Document, #3 Misc. Document, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Envelope)(mh)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/11/2020. (cnd)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/11/20. (jss)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to join party of the petitioners by Brian Griffey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Based on plaintiffs trust account statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of this action, the Court will not require plaintiff to pay the initial partial filing fee as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A), but he shall be assessed the total $350.00 filing fee. (copy cmrr, copy Trustee Clerk) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 12/9/20. (jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jss).
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jayson Bradley White. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets)(jss)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Jayson Bradley White. (jss)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jayson Bradley White. (jss)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Betsy C. Jividen filed by Jayson Bradley White. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Jividen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy C. Jividen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayson Bradley White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jeremy Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jamie Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?